U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-20029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kirby, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [PSR Sentencing Recommendation - USPO]
  • April 22, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - FINAL]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 19, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - INITIAL]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.