U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10591
  • Case Name: Lisa Daphene Woodard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Order to Submit]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Text Order Granting Request to Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Withdrawal of Document re: Claims]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Order on Motion for Relief from Stay]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Certificate of Service]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Court's Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Order and Negative Notice Co-Debtor Stay (Chambers Only)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Relief from Stay (Motion)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Notice of Change of Address (Misc Menu)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.