U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-bk-13768
  • Case Name: James L Fuller and Maribeth P Fuller
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Entered]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Withdrawing Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Motion to Dismiss Case (Tr 13)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.