U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:23-bk-71542
  • Case Name: Christopher Woolems and Christine Woolems
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Motion to Borrow / Incur]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Borrow / Incur]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Revoke Payroll Deduction (Tr 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.