U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-70482
  • Case Name: Janeth Cabrera
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
March, 2025
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.