U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10148
  • Case Name: Ashley Watt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Withdraw Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Submit]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order Withdrawing Motion to Dismiss Upon Conditions]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing Continued (Courtroom)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Final Payment in FULL]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Withdraw Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Dismiss BK Case (Motion)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Extend / Enlarge Time to Pay Filing Fee]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Extend / Enlarge Time to Pay Filing Fee]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.