U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10955
  • Case Name: Darrell Dwayne Maxwell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order on Motion to Avoid Lien]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order to Submit]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Avoid Lien]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Continue Meeting of Creditors (Motion)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Credit Counseling Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.