U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10517
  • Case Name: Jared Casleton and Amanda Casleton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Withdrawal of Claim (eClaims)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions (Tr 13)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.