U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-10953
  • Case Name: Anquanette Denise Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Notice of Change of Address (Misc Menu)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Chapter 7 Final Payment in FULL]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.