U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-10952
  • Case Name: Lisa Dawn Mott
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.