U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10502
  • Case Name: Chasity Nicole Withers and Jerome Lamar Withers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing Not Held (Courtroom)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.