U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10447
  • Case Name: Sarilee Nash
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Sustaining Objection (Tr 13)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing Not Held (Courtroom)]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.