U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-bk-12133
  • Case Name: Priscilla Ann Branch
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Additional/Amended Notice of Claim Filed]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order Withdrawing Motion to Dismiss Upon Conditions]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.