U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-70487
  • Case Name: Deonte Fields
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Chapter 7 Final Payment in FULL]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Creditor Request for Notice (batch)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.