U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-70483
  • Case Name: Loni Jo Jones
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
March, 2025
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.