U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-bk-70094
  • Case Name: North Arkansas Regenerative Medicine, Ltd
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Trustee]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Hearing Held (Courtroom)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Motion to Dismiss Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.