U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-bk-70073
  • Case Name: Lisa Taylor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Notice of Assets]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Request for Notice of Assets (Meeting Held)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order on Motion for Relief from Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order and Negative Notice (Chambers Only)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Relief from Stay (Motion)]
March, 2025
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.