U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-40013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cox
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order re Sentencing Memorandum Due after PSR - TEXT ONLY]
  • April 16, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - FINAL]
  • April 16, 2025: [PSR Sentencing Recommendation - USPO]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - INITIAL]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.