U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10965
  • Case Name: Travis M. Fletcher and Elissa Rose Jett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Credit Counseling Not Filed]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.