U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-10962
  • Case Name: Dakota Skudlark and Summer Skudlark
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.