U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10959
  • Case Name: Dylan Duos
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
March, 2025
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.