U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-10673
  • Case Name: Zabrina Murray and Christopher Murray
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Creditor Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.