U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-70023
  • Case Name: Timothy Hopper and Jennifer Hopper
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Amended Plan]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Claim (Obj Menu)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Modify Plan (Tr 13)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.