U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-70329
  • Case Name: Tyronda Nicole Scates
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Entered]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Withdrawing Objection (Tr 13)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.