U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-70017
  • Case Name: Rickie Lee Hill
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing Not Held (Courtroom)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Entered]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Withdrawing Objection (Tr 13)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of Amended Plan]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.