U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10968
  • Case Name: Adrianna NaShae Williams
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.