U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-10349
  • Case Name: Willie Bonner and Theresa Bonner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order on Motion to Delay Discharge]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Reaff]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Extend / Enlarge Time to File Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order to Submit]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Delay Discharge]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.