U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-70345
  • Case Name: Alberto Amado and Esther Vargas de Amado
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
March, 2025
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.