U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-70491
  • Case Name: Carolina W Nichols
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.