U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum from U.S. Marshal Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 28, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 26, 2025: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order to Lodge Detainer]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.