U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-bk-10786
  • Case Name: Johnny Gayle Hoop and Clarinda Beth Hoop
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Entered]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Withdrawing Objection (Tr 13)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Withdrawing Motion to Dismiss Upon Conditions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.