U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-14227
  • Case Name: Jeffrey Ek
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.