U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-10971
  • Case Name: Haley Watkins and Jonathan Watkins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order on Motion for Relief from Stay]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order on Motion to Borrow / Incur]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Borrow / Incur]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Chapter 7 Final Payment in FULL]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Relief from Stay (Motion)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.