U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-12544
  • Case Name: Vonnerdette LaKeisha Burton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing Continued (Courtroom)]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Summary Notice of Claims Filed]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Withdrawing Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of Amended Plan]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Withdrawing Motion to Dismiss Upon Conditions]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Motion to Dismiss Case (Tr 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.