U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-bk-13864
  • Case Name: Sharon Renae Barnes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Chapter 7 Final Payment in FULL]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order on Motion to Reinstate Case]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Reinstate Case]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order Vacating / Setting Aside Dismissal Order]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order Dismissing Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.