U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-70493
  • Case Name: Suzie Ruiz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order and Negative Notice (Chambers Only)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Relief from Stay (Motion)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Misc Menu)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Misc Menu)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Compensation 13]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 (fee) (Case Upload)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan- case upload]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.