U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-bk-70762
  • Case Name: Austin Harris
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Amended Order]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.