U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-10979
  • Case Name: Kenneth R Daniels
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.