U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10067
  • Case Name: Steven Caplinger and Elizabeth Caplinger
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Reinstate Case]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Ordr on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Shorten Time]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Reinstate Case]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.