U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10064
  • Case Name: Derrick Bernard Jackson and Shannon Latrece Jackson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order Entered]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order Withdrawing Objection (Tr 13)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Withdraw/Rescind/Terminate Document]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Withdraw/Rescind/Terminate Document]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Transfer of Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.