U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10056
  • Case Name: Matthew Campbell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Courtroom Deputy Calendar Update]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Response to Motion/Document]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Relief from Stay (Motion)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.