U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10978
  • Case Name: Theresa A Redix
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Receipt of Case Filing Fee]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education (Court)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Receipt of Case Filing Fee]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Social Security Number (Form 121)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Voluntary Petition (Ch 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.