U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-10976
  • Case Name: Christopher L Miller
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Creditor Request for Notice (batch)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Creditor Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.