U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-70496
  • Case Name: Scheena L Wilkins and David S. Wilkins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Creditor Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload (Jdb)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 (fee) (Case Upload)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.