U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-bk-70495
  • Case Name: Tracy Nicole Hancock
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • May 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
April, 2025
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Creditor Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Credit Counseling Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.