U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-bk-70206
  • Case Name: Danny N. Neighbors
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Chapter 7 Final Payment in FULL]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.