U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10980
  • Case Name: James Dale Wilcox, Jr. and Brenda Darlene Wilcox
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Hearing Held]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Small Business Statement of Operations]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 11)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 11)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Certificate of Service]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 11)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Pre-Status Conference Report (Ch 11)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Meeting of Creditors Continued (UST)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Employ (Motion)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Small Business Cash Flow Statement]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Small Business Balance Sheet]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Small Business Statement of Operations]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Court)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 11)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Courtroom Deputy Calendar Update]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Small Business Income Tax Return]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Order on Motion to Restrict Public Access/Redact]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Restrict Public Access/Redact]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Seal Document]
  • April 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 11)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Small Business Income Tax Return]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Small Business Balance Sheet]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Small Business Cash Flow Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Order on Motion for Issuance of Order (UST)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Issuance of Order (UST)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Stipulation (UST)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Operating Report]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Order Setting Status Conference]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Extend Time]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Administrative Expenses]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Authority]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Notice Appointing Ch. 11 Subchapter V Trustee]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Court)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Court)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Small Business or SubV Designation]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Small Business or SubV Designation]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Brister, Beverly I [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 11)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 11)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (UST)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Ch 11)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.