U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-70034
  • Case Name: Lisa Nelson McCatherine
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of Amended Plan]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.