U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-70006
  • Case Name: Megan Ellis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Trustee Hamilton M [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.