U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-10983
  • Case Name: Lauri Dixon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.